Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023