|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-71
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 29 NAYS 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Receded from 1 amendment(s) (509046)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Refused to concur, requested Senate to recede
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment 509046 Refuse to Concur
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment 336516 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (336516, 509046)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1506
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 93, NAYS 14
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Amendment 537621 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|