|
06/27/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-293
|
|
|
|
06/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/14/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/04/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 106, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|