Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1405 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/23/2023

                       
 
CS/HB 1405  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1405-01-c1 
Page 1 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to biosolids; creating s. 403.0674, 2 
F.S.; establishing a biosolids grant program within 3 
the Department of Environmental Protection; 4 
authorizing the department, subject to legislative 5 
appropriation, to provide grants to counties and 6 
municipalities for certain wastewater conversion 7 
projects; providing requirements for the 8 
prioritization and funding of such projects; 9 
authorizing the department to wai ve the funding match 10 
requirement for specified projects; amending s. 11 
403.0855, F.S.; prohibiting the department from 12 
authorizing land application site permits for Class B 13 
biosolids within subwatersheds of certain impaired 14 
waterbodies and waterbody segments unless applicants 15 
can demonstrate that such biosolids meet certain 16 
requirements; requiring the department to annually 17 
publish certain maps; requiring land application site 18 
permits for Class B biosolids to meet certain 19 
requirements by specified dates; prov iding an 20 
effective date. 21 
 22 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 23 
 24 
 Section 1.  Section 403.0674, Florida Statutes, is created 25     
 
CS/HB 1405  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1405-01-c1 
Page 2 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
to read: 26 
 403.0674  Biosolids grant program. —A biosolids grant 27 
program is established within the departme nt. 28 
 (1)  Subject to the appropriation of funds by the 29 
Legislature, the department may provide grants to counties and 30 
municipalities in this state to support projects to construct, 31 
upgrade, expand, or retrofit domestic facilities that convert 32 
wastewater residuals to Class AA biosolids. An applicant for a 33 
biosolids grant must be a county or municipal governmental 34 
entity; however, applicants are encouraged to form public -35 
private partnerships with private utilities and firms. 36 
 (2)  In allocating grant funds, t he department shall 37 
prioritize projects by considering the economic and market 38 
feasibility of each project, as well as the environmental 39 
benefit that a project may provide. 40 
 (a)  To evaluate the economic and market feasibility of a 41 
project, the department shall review a detailed cost -benefit 42 
analysis for the project which includes the overall economic 43 
impact and current and future market potential of the project, 44 
including current or prospective buyers or users of the Class AA 45 
biosolids of the project. 46 
 (b) To evaluate the environmental benefit of a project, 47 
the department shall review an analysis of how the Class AA 48 
biosolids of the project are projected to minimize the migration 49 
of nutrients and other pollutants that degrade water quality. 50     
 
CS/HB 1405  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1405-01-c1 
Page 3 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
 (3)  The department shall administer the grant program so 51 
that, of the funds made available each year under this section: 52 
 (a)  At least 33 percent is reserved for projects that 53 
convert wastewater residuals into composted Class AA biosolids 54 
that meet the requirements of the United States Composting 55 
Council Seal of Testing Assurance Program as being fully 56 
stabilized. 57 
 (b)  At least 33 percent is reserved for projects that 58 
convert wastewater residuals into Class AA biosolids and a 59 
solution of ammonia nitrogen, a valuable a lternative to 60 
synthetic nitrogen fertilizers. 61 
 (c)  At least 10 percent is reserved for projects within an 62 
area designated as a rural area of opportunity under s. 63 
288.0656. 64 
 (4)  If the department does not receive sufficient 65 
applications for projects descr ibed in subsection (3), the 66 
department may reallocate the reserved funds to other projects 67 
prioritized by the department pursuant to subsection (2). 68 
 (5)(a)  Except as provided in paragraph (b), the department 69 
shall require that each biosolids grant has a minimum of a 50 70 
percent funding match from local, state, federal, or private 71 
funds. 72 
 (b)  The department may waive, in whole or in part, the 73 
funding match requirement in paragraph (a) for proposed projects 74 
within an area designated as a rural area of opportunity under 75     
 
CS/HB 1405  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1405-01-c1 
Page 4 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
s. 288.0656. 76 
 Section 2.  Subsections (7) and (8) are added to section 77 
403.0855, Florida Statutes, to read: 78 
 403.0855  Biosolids management. — 79 
 (7)  The department may not authorize a land application 80 
site permit for Class B biosolids within the subwatershed of a 81 
waterbody or waterbody segment listed as impaired for nitrogen 82 
or phosphorus pursuant to s. 403.067 or within an adjoining 83 
upstream subwatershed containing surface waters that flow to a 84 
waterbody listed as impaired for nitrogen or phosphorus pursuant 85 
to s. 403.067 unless the applicant affirmatively demonstrates 86 
that the phosphorus and nitrogen in such biosolids will not add 87 
to the nutrient load in the impaired subwatershed. This 88 
demonstration must be based on achieving a net balance between 89 
nutrient imports relative to exports on the permitted land 90 
application site. Ex ports may only include nutrients removed 91 
from the subwatershed through products generated on the 92 
permitted land application site. Beginning November 1, 2023, and 93 
each November 1 thereafter, the department shall publish updated 94 
maps designating the subwater sheds of waterbodies protected 95 
under this subsection. 96 
 (8)  New or renewed land application site permits for Class 97 
B biosolids issued after November 1, 2023, must meet the 98 
requirements of subsection (7) by July 1, 2024. All land 99 
application site permits fo r Class B biosolids must meet the 100     
 
CS/HB 1405  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1405-01-c1 
Page 5 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
requirements of subsection (7) by July 1, 2025. 101 
 Section 3.  This act shall take effect July 1, 2023. 102