House | 05/01/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1416 (Ch. 2023-315), CS/HB 1301 (Ch. 2023-301) | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Reported out of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Favorable by Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 04/07/2023 | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Filed |