House
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1396 (Ch. 2023-259)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted SB 1396
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|