House
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 552 (Ch. 2023-177)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee (Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|