Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1459 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 28, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023