Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Received | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | In Messages | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Passed; YEAS 69, NAYS 36 | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Amendment 010837 Failed | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Amendment 147181 ruled out of order | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Amendment 298815 ruled out of order | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported out of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Favorable by Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Filed |