Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1551 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023