Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1567 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 20, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 23, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023