House
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1540 (Ch. 2023-260), CS/SB 1542 (Ch. 2023-261)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|