Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1589 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/06/2023

                               
 
HB 1589  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1589-00 
Page 1 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to distribution of cigarette tax 2 
funds; amending s. 210.20, F.S.; revising the 3 
percentage of certain funds that are paid to specified 4 
entities; revising the entities that receive such 5 
funds; conforming provisions to changes made by the 6 
act; providing an effective date. 7 
 8 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 9 
 10 
 Section 1.  Paragraph (b) of subsection (2) of section 11 
210.20, Florida Statutes, is amended to read: 12 
 210.20  Employees and assistants; distribution of funds. — 13 
 (2)  As collections are received by the division from such 14 
cigarette taxes, it shall pay the same into a trust fund in the 15 
State Treasury designated "Cigarett e Tax Collection Trust Fund" 16 
which shall be paid and distributed as follows: 17 
 (b)  Beginning July 1, 2004, and continuing through June 18 
30, 2013, the division shall from month to month certify to the 19 
Chief Financial Officer the amount derived from the cigar ette 20 
tax imposed by s. 210.02, less the service charges provided for 21 
in s. 215.20 and less 0.9 percent of the amount derived from the 22 
cigarette tax imposed by s. 210.02, which shall be deposited 23 
into the Alcoholic Beverage and Tobacco Trust Fund, specifyin g 24 
an amount equal to 1.47 percent of the net collections, and that 25     
 
HB 1589  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1589-00 
Page 2 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
amount shall be paid to the Board of Directors of the H. Lee 26 
Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute, established under 27 
s. 1004.43, by warrant drawn by the Chief Financial Officer. 28 
Beginning July 1, 2014, and continuing through June 30, 2021, 29 
the division shall from month to month certify to the Chief 30 
Financial Officer the amount derived from the cigarette tax 31 
imposed by s. 210.02, less the service charges provided for in 32 
s. 215.20 and less 0.9 percent of the amount derived from the 33 
cigarette tax imposed by s. 210.02, which shall be deposited 34 
into the Alcoholic Beverage and Tobacco Trust Fund, specifying 35 
an amount equal to 4.04 percent of the net collections, and that 36 
amount shall be paid to the Board of Directors of the H. Lee 37 
Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute, established under 38 
s. 1004.43, by warrant drawn by the Chief Financial Officer. 39 
Beginning July 1, 2023 2021, and continuing through June 30, 40 
2024, the division shall fro m month to month certify to the 41 
Chief Financial Officer the amount derived from the cigarette 42 
tax imposed by s. 210.02, less the service charges provided for 43 
in s. 215.20 and less 0.9 percent of the amount derived from the 44 
cigarette tax imposed by s. 210.0 2, which shall be deposited 45 
into the Alcoholic Beverage and Tobacco Trust Fund, specifying 46 
an amount equal to 21 7 percent of the net collections, and that 47 
amount shall be paid in equal amounts to the Board of Directors 48 
of the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute, 49 
established under s. 1004.43, the Board of Directors of the 50     
 
HB 1589  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1589-00 
Page 3 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
Sylvester Comprehensive Cancer Center of the University of 51 
Miami, and the Board of Directors of the University of Florida 52 
Shands Cancer Center by warrant drawn by the Chief Financial 53 
Officer. Beginning July 1, 2024, and continuing through June 30, 54 
2054, the division shall from month to month certify to the 55 
Chief Financial Officer the amount derived from the cigarette 56 
tax imposed by s. 210.02, less the service charges provide d for 57 
in s. 215.20 and less 0.9 percent of the amount derived from the 58 
cigarette tax imposed by s. 210.02, which shall be deposited 59 
into the Alcoholic Beverage and Tobacco Trust Fund, specifying 60 
an amount equal to 30 10 percent of the net collections, and 61 
that amount shall be paid in equal amounts to the Board of 62 
Directors of the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research 63 
Institute, established under s. 1004.43, the Board of Directors 64 
of the Sylvester Comprehensive Cancer Center of the University 65 
of Miami, and the Board of Directors of the University of 66 
Florida Shands Cancer Center by warrant drawn by the Chief 67 
Financial Officer. These funds are appropriated monthly out of 68 
the Cigarette Tax Collection Trust Fund, to be used for lawful 69 
purposes, including cons tructing, furnishing, equipping, 70 
financing, operating, and maintaining cancer research and 71 
clinical and related facilities; furnishing, equipping, 72 
operating, and maintaining other properties owned or leased by 73 
the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute, the 74 
Sylvester Comprehensive Cancer Center of the University of 75     
 
HB 1589  	2023 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1589-00 
Page 4 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
Miami, and the University of Florida Shands Cancer Center ; and 76 
paying costs incurred in connection with purchasing, financing, 77 
operating, and maintaining such equipment, facilities, and 78 
properties. In fiscal years 2023-2024 2004-2005 and thereafter, 79 
the appropriation to the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and 80 
Research Institute, the Sylvester Comprehensive Cancer Center of 81 
the University of Miami, and the University of Florida Shands 82 
Cancer Center authorized by this paragraph shall not be less 83 
than the amount that would have been paid to the H. Lee Moffitt 84 
Cancer Center and Research Institute in fiscal year 2001 -2002, 85 
had this paragraph been in effect. 86 
 Section 2.  This act shall take e ffect July 1, 2023. 87