Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1595 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 31, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023