House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Favorable with CS by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Filed |