House | 04/04/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Substituted SB 2502 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/3/2023) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Filed |