Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H5303 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023