House
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2 (Ch. 2023-318)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted SB 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|