Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6015 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023