|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-74
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted for SB 7004
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/30/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|