House | 03/16/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 42 (Ch. 2023-13) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Substituted SB 42 | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Filed |