Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Received | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Referred to Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | In Messages | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed as amended; YEAS 80, NAYS 29 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Amendment 125539 adopted | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Filed |