|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-77
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment 459628 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (459628)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted for SB 7056
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 105, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|