05/26/2023 | Chapter No. 2023-157 | |||
05/25/2023 | Approved by Governor | |||
05/23/2023 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
House | 05/05/2023 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Amendment 283904 Concur | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Added to Senate Message List | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Amendment(s) adopted (283904) | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Substituted for CS/SB 7062 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Withdrawn from Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Received | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Filed |