House | 05/02/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7052 (Ch. 2023-172) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Reported out of Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Filed |