Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0006 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/24/2023

                     
 
THE FLORIDA SENATE 
SPECIAL MASTER ON CLAIM BILLS 
Location 
409 The Capitol 
Mailing Address 
404 South Monroe Street 
Tallahassee, Florida  32399-1100 
(850) 487-5229 
 
 
 
DATE COMM ACTION 
3/24/23 SM Favorable 
 JU  
 CA  
 RC  
March 24, 2023 
 
The Honorable Kathleen Passidomo 
President, The Florida Senate 
Suite 409, The Capitol 
Tallahassee, Florida 32399-1100 
 
Re: SB 6 – Senator Rodriguez 
HB 6011 – Representative Porras 
Relief of Jason Sanchez 
 
SPECIAL MASTER’S FINAL REPORT 
 
 	THIS IS AN UNCONTEST ED CLAIM BILL FOR LO CAL 
FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $950,000 BASED ON A 
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE ESTATE OF 
JASON SANCHEZ AND MI AMI-DADE COUNTY WHIC H 
RESOLVED A CIVIL ACT ION THAT AROSE FROM THE 
NEGLIGENT OPERATION OF A COUNTY BUS CAUS ING 
THE DEATH OF JASON SANCHEZ. 
 
 
FINDINGS OF FACT: On May 13, 2019, at approximately 7:49am, Jason Sanchez 
was driving his motorcycle heading north on SW 107
th
 Ave. in 
Miami-Dade County, Florida. At the intersection of 107
th
 Ave. 
and 176
th
 St., Alcides Puello, who was operating a Miami-
Dade County bus, rolled through a stop sign while making a 
left hand turn from 176
th
 St. onto 107
th
 Ave. This action placed 
the bus which Mr. Puello was operating directly in the path of 
Mr. Sanchez’s motorcycle and, although Mr. Sanchez took 
evasive action, his motorcycle collided with the side of the 
bus. This collision and the resulting injuries caused Mr. 
Sanchez’s death at the scene of the accident. 
 
At the time the accident occurred, it was morning and the 
weather was warm, clear, and dry. There was a posted speed  SPECIAL MASTER’S FINAL REPORT – SB 6  
March 24, 2023 
Page 2 
 
limit of 30mph and the roadway was dry with paved shoulders 
and concrete curbing. The roadway was also free of obvious 
defects or obstructions which would have affected the 
collision.  
 
Miami-Dade Police were called to the scene and the incident 
was investigate by the traffic homicide unit. Detective 
Jonathan Mesa filed the traffic homicide report and concluded 
that the accident was caused by Mr. Puello due to Mr. Puello 
failing observe Mr. Sanchez approaching the intersection, 
failing to make a complete stop at the posted stop sign, and 
subsequently failing to yield the right-of-way to Mr. Sanchez. 
Additionally, bus surveillance video footage shows Mr. Puello 
failing to come to a complete stop at that stop sign, as well as 
the three previous stop signs he encountered. 
 
Mr. Sanchez was pronounced deceased at the scene and was 
subsequently transported to the Miami-Dade Medical 
Examiner’s Office. The cause of death was determined to be 
multiple blunt force trauma as a result of the crash. 
Additionally, toxicology tests revealed that Mr. Sanchez was 
not under the influence of drugs or alcohol at the time of the 
accident. 
 
Mr. Sanchez is survived by his mother, Jaqueline Abreu, and 
his father, Manuel Sanchez. They are divorced and Mrs. 
Abreu is remarried. Both parents, as well as Mr. Sanchez’s 
brother, testified at the hearing that the family was very close. 
In fact, Mr. Sanchez was living with his father at the time of 
the accident and Manuel Sanchez stated that Jason would 
help around tasks around the house and help buying food and 
other household items. Both are citizens of the United States. 
Mrs. Abreu has no criminal history while Manuel Sanchez was 
convicted of a drug related felony in 1987 for which he served 
five years in prison. 
 
 
LITIGATION HISTORY: On September 17, 2019, Mrs. Abreu filed a complaint as the 
representative of the estate of Jason Sanchez with the 
Eleventh Judicial Circuit Court for Miami-Dade County. The 
complaint alleged that Mr. Sanchez’s death was caused due 
to a reckless maneuver by Mr. Puello which caused the bus 
that Mr. Puello was driving to unlawfully obstruct oncoming 
traffic. Miami-Dade County’s initial answer to the complaint, 
filed on November 20, 2019, generally denied liability for Mr.  SPECIAL MASTER’S FINAL REPORT – SB 6  
March 24, 2023 
Page 3 
 
Sanchez’s death, however, on June 25, 2021, Miami-Dade 
County responded to the plaintiff’s request for admissions the 
county admitted to the facts that Mr. Puello had failed to come 
to a complete stop at the stop sign and failed to yield the right 
of way to Mr. Sanchez. 
 
On April 26, 2022, the plaintiff and Miami-Dade County 
entered into a settlement agreement. The County agreed to 
pay $1.25 million to the estate of Jason Sanchez, on behalf of 
the survivors Mrs. Abreu and Manuel Sanchez. The plaintiff 
agreed to release all claims for the accident and Miami-Dade 
County agreed not to oppose the claim bill. Although in the 
settlement agreement, Miami-Dade County stated that it 
denied liability and was simply settling to avoid litigation, at 
the hearing the attorney for the County, Mr. Grob, stated that 
the County has admitted to negligence in the matter. 
Additionally, Mr. Grob stated that any amount of comparative 
negligence on the part of Mr. Sanchez in causing the accident 
had been taken into account when drafting the settlement. 
 
As part of the settlement, Ms. Abreu and Manuel Sanchez 
agreed to set aside sufficient funds to pay any and all 
Medicare and Medicaid bills, claims, penalties, interest fines, 
and liens as necessary. In the hearing the attorney for the 
plaintiff, Mr. McCarron, stated that there are no outstanding 
liens or debts that need to be paid. The county has paid the 
statutory maximum amount of $300,000 leaving the remaining 
$950,000 to be paid should the claim bill pass. 
 
 
CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: Section 316.123, F.S., requires a driver of a vehicle 
approaching a stop intersection indicated by a stop sign to 
stop before entering the intersection. After stopping, the driver 
is to yield the right-of-way to any vehicle which … is 
approaching so closely on the highway as to constitute an 
immediate hazard during the time when the driver is moving 
across or within the intersection. Mr. Puello had a statutory 
duty to yield the right-of-way to Mr. Sanchez’s vehicle, which 
he negligently failed to do. This breach was the direct cause 
of the collision between the two vehicles which resulted in Mr. 
Sanchez’s death. 
 
Under the doctrine of respondeat superior, Miami-Dade 
County is vicariously liable for the negligence of its agents and 
employees, when such acts are within the course and scope  SPECIAL MASTER’S FINAL REPORT – SB 6  
March 24, 2023 
Page 4 
 
of the agency or employment. See Mallory v. O'Neil, 69 So.2d 
313 (Fla.1954), and s. 768.28, F.S. At the time of the accident, 
Mr. Puello was an employee of Miami-Dade County who was 
acting within the course and scope of his employment and 
operating a county vehicle which caused the collision and 
resulting death. Accordingly, the negligence of Mr. Puello is 
attributable to Miami-Dade County. 
 
The amount of $1.25 million in damages is agreed to by 
settlement and are reasonable damages. The Florida 
Wrongful Death Act in s. 768.21(4), F.S., allows parents of 
adult children to recover for pain and suffering as long as 
there are no other survivors as is the case here. Additionally, 
the Act in s. 768.21(5) and (6), allows recovery for funeral 
expenses and lost wages. Section 768.28, F.S., limits 
recovery to $300,000 and without passage of this claim bill, 
the full amount of the settlement cannot be paid. 
 
ATTORNEY FEES: Section 768.28(8), F.S., states that no attorney may charge, 
demand, receive, or collect for services rendered, fees in 
excess of 25 percent of any judgment or settlement. 
Claimant’s counsel, the Haggard Law Firm, has submitted an 
affidavit that its fees, as well as the lobbying fees, costs, and 
other similar expenses relating to this claim will not exceed 25 
percent of the total amount awarded under the claim bill. 
 
 
RECOMMENDATIONS: Based upon the foregoing, I recommend that Senate Bill 6 be 
reported FAVORABLY. 
 
Respectfully submitted, 
Daniel Looke 
Senate Special Master 
cc: Secretary of the Senate