Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0006 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023