Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0010 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023