03/27/2023 | Chapter No. 2023-9 | |||
03/24/2023 | Approved by Governor | |||
03/22/2023 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Ordered enrolled | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Added to Third Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Placed on 3rd reading | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Substituted for HB 7013 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/16/2023) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Immediately certified | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/23 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed |