Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Health Policy | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Health Policy | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 12/15/2022 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 11/22/2022 | Filed |