Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/17/23, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/06/2022 | Filed |