Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0076 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis January 17, 2023
Analysis January 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 16, 2023