Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0102 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 8, 2023
Analysis February 7, 2023