Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/15/23, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | Filed |