Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | Filed |