Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 179 (Ch. 2023-182)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 179
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|