Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 272 (Ch. 2023-248) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/14/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | Filed |