Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 02/07/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Filed |