Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023