|
05/18/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-89, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 240 (Ch. 2023-81)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (556184)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/12/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|