Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | CS by Education Postsecondary read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | CS by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 02/08/23, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Education Postsecondary; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Filed |