Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0216 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023