Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0230 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 9, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023