Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0238 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 2, 2023