Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0242 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 9, 2023