The Florida Senate HOUSE MESSAGE SUMMARY Prepared By: The Professional Staff of the Committee on Community Affairs [2023s00250.hms.ca] BILL: CS/CS/SB 250, Engrossed 1 INTRODUCER: Senator Martin SUBJECT: Natural Emgencies DATE: April 26, 2023 I.Amendments Contained in Message: House Amendment - 791633 (body with title) II.Summary of Amendments Contained in Message: House Amendment - 791633 makes the following changes to the Senate bill: Authorizes the extension for fire control district performance reviews for only those districts located within 50 miles of where Hurricane Ian made landfall that were required to submit reports by July 1, 2023, and requires submission of the report by January 1, 2024. Makes the provision on the tolling and extension of permits following an emergency declaration retroactive to September 28, 2022. Makes the provision prohibiting local governments from proposing or adopting more restrictive or burdensome amendments to its comprehensive plan or land development regulations retroactive to September 28, 2022, instead of September 29, 2022. Prohibits local governments from proposing or adopting a moratorium on construction, reconstruction, or redevelopment of any property damaged by Hurricane Ian or Nicole before October 1, 2024, and applies it retroactively to September 28, 2022. Adds a new section to provide that public utilities are not liable for damages based in whole or in part on changes in the reliability, continuity, or qualify of utility services which arise out of an emergency or disaster. Removes the appropriation to the Office of Insurance Regulation for hurricane-related market conduct activity. Makes a technical change regarding the continuing contracts provision and the reversion to current law after the provision expires.