LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S0250
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S0250
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S0250
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 24, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
May 1, 2023
Compare
Bill
April 3, 2023
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 1, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
April 26, 2023
Analysis
March 27, 2023
Analysis
March 22, 2023
Analysis
March 17, 2023
Analysis
March 14, 2023
Comm Sub
Bill
March 27, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 17, 2023
Compare