|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-43, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 238 (Ch. 2023-42)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 84, NAYS 31
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 29 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (611288)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|