|
06/07/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-201, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1648 (Ch. 2023-262)
|
|
|
|
06/06/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 110, NAYS 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment 816662 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment 338388 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment 519510 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (338513, 471655, 703943)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (338388, 519510, 816662)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 106, NAYS 10
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 703943 engrossed amendment (replaces 526273, 490179)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 338513 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 526273 adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 490179 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 471655 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (218598, 705396)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/24/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|