Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed |